Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Robyn Finkenthal Kulbarsh, filed a(n) Miscellaneous - Other case represented by David A Kulwicki, Howard D Mishkind, against Ariel Hyman, Marie Gelle, Menorah Park Foundation In Care Of Taft Services Solutions Corp., Montefiore, Montefiore Foundation In Care Of Seth R. Vilensky, (total of 8) See All represented by Bret C Perry, Brian F. Lange, Donald J Richardson, Jane F. Warner, Joseph F. Petros, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Cuyahoga County, OH, . Cuyahoga County, OH Superior Courts with DEBORAH M TURNER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 05, 2021 |
CategoryMiscellaneous - Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCuyahoga County, OH |
|
Case Outcome TypeDisp. Transct |
PLTFS. MOTION FOR EXTESION OF TME HOWARD D MISHKIND (0009238)
Date: October 05, 2021PLTFS. MOTION FOR EXTESION OF TME HOWARD D MISHKIND (0009238) 09/15/2022 - UNKNOWN
Date: October 05, 2021NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL
Date: June 13, 2023NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL IN FEDERAL COURT
Date: November 08, 2021NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL
Date: November 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
COURT COST ASSESSED ROBYN FINKENTHAL KULBARSH BILL AMOUNT 471.44 PAID AMOUNT 359.44 AMOUNT DUE 112 CS |
|
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE RECEIVED STATING CASE REMANDED BACK TO THE CUYAHOGA COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS FROM U.S. DISTRICT COURT. FEDERAL COURT CASE NO. 1:23-CV-01183 - CUYAHOGA COUNTY COMMON PLEAS COURT CASE NO. CV-21-953958. OT |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT ON ACCOUNT MADE ON BEHALF OF FINKENTHAL KULBARSH/ROBYN/ IN THE AMOUNT OF $109.44 | |
June 16, 2023 |
JUDGMENT ENTRY REGULAR MAIL SERVICE MARIE GELLE |
||
June 16, 2023 |
JUDGMENT ENTRY REGULAR MAIL SERVICE TINA R KING |
||
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(50877233) SENT BY REGULAR MAIL SERVICE. TO: TINA R KING 1349 NEWTON STREET TALLMADGE, OH 44278 SR |
|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(50877234) SENT BY REGULAR MAIL SERVICE. TO: MARIE GELLE 199 KENWICK DRIVE NORTHFIELD, OH 44067 SR |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL (TITLE 28 U.S. CODE 1441, ET SEQ.) (FILED 06/13/2023), THE CAPTIONED CASE IS TRANSFERRED TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT (CASE NO. 1:23 CV 01183) AND THIS COURT SHALL PROCEED NO FURTHER UNLESS AND UNTIL THE CASE IS REMANDED. COURT COST ASSESSED AS EACH THEIR OWN. PURSUANT TO CIV.R. 58(B), THE CLERK OF COURTS IS DIRECTED TO SERVE THIS JUDGMENT IN A MANNER PRESCRIBED BY CIV.R. 5(B). THE CLERK MUST INDICATE ON THE DOCKET THE NAMES AND ADDRESSES OF ALL PARTIES, THE METHOD OF SERVICE, AND THE COSTS ASSOCIATED WITH THIS SERVICE. NOTICE ISSUED JE |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(50877228) SENT BY EMAIL. TO: JANE F. WARNER DOCKET@BSMPH SR |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(50877229) SENT BY EMAIL. TO: MATTHEW D GURBACH MGURBACH@BRICKERGRAYDON SR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.