Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dwayne Webb, filed a(n) Tort-Miscellaneous case represented by David J. Jansky, Lacy Leduc, Michael S Schroeder, against Clayton Rupanovic, Robert H. Blowers, Jr., Source One Adjusters Of Ohio, Inc., represented by Kyle A Johnson, in the jurisdiction of Cuyahoga County, OH, . Cuyahoga County, OH Superior Courts with SHERRIE MIDAY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2021 |
CategoryTort-Miscellaneous |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCuyahoga County, OH |
|
Case Outcome TypeDis. W/Prej |
CASE FILED: COMPLAINT
Date: January 26, 2021MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE FILED DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION 04/14/2021 - DENIED
Date: February 23, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, FILED P1 DWAYNE WEBB MICHAEL S SCHROEDER 0065267. NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: January 31, 2022MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE FILED DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION
Date: February 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
COURT COST ASSESSED CLAYTON RUPANOVIC BILL AMOUNT 293.82 PAID AMOUNT 250 AMOUNT DUE 43.82 CS |
|
March 07, 2022 |
JUDGMENT ENTRY REGULAR MAIL SERVICE ROBERT H. BLOWERS, JR. |
||
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(46889193) SENT BY REGULAR MAIL SERVICE. TO: ROBERT H. BLOWERS, JR. 2306 LOCUST STREET FULTON, OH 44614 SR |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(46889112) SENT BY REGULAR MAIL SERVICE. TO: ROBERT H. BLOWERS, JR. 2306 LOCUST STREET FULTON, OH 44614 SR |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
PURSUANT TO THE DISMISSAL ENTRY FILED 3/2/2022, THIS CASE HAS SETTLED. THIS CASE IS HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AT DEFENDANT CLAYTON RUPANOVIC'S COST. THE COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION OVER ENFORCING THE TERMS OF THE SETTLEMENT. COURT COST ASSESSED AS DIRECTED. PURSUANT TO CIV.R. 58(B), THE CLERK OF COURTS IS DIRECTED TO SERVE THIS JUDGMENT IN A MANNER PRESCRIBED BY CIV.R. 5(B). THE CLERK MUST INDICATE ON THE DOCKET THE NAMES AND ADDRESSES OF ALL PARTIES, THE METHOD OF SERVICE, AND THE COSTS ASSOCIATED WITH THIS SERVICE. NOTICE ISSUED JE |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
TRIAL BY JURY SCHEDULED FOR 03/08/2022 AT 09:00 AM IS CANCELLED. SC |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(46889192) SENT BY EMAIL. TO: DAVID J. JANSKY FIRM@GSLAWOHIO SR |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(46889109) SENT BY EMAIL. TO: DAVID J. JANSKY DAVID@GSLAWOHIO SR |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(46889111) SENT BY EMAIL. TO: KYLE A JOHNSON KAJOHNSON@BMDLLC SR |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(46889108) SENT BY EMAIL. TO: MICHAEL S SCHROEDER FIRM@GSLAWOHIO SR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.