Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Newton, Melissa, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against A&H Investments Llc, Newton Service And Parts Llc, Newton, Timothy, in the jurisdiction of Columbiana County. This case was filed in Columbiana County Superior Courts with WASHAM, SCOTT A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 02, 2024 |
CategoryDivorce Without Children |
Last RefreshedApril 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationColumbiana County, OH |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
This complaint is a divorce case filed by Melissa Newton against Timothy Newton, Newton Service and Parts, LLC, and A&H Investments, LLC. Melissa Newton is seeking a fair share of marital assets, including businesses, real estate, and other entities....
SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT WITH COPY OF COMPLAINT
Date: April 04, 2024COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE FILED BY ATTY LYNN SFARA BRUNO
Date: April 03, 2024UNSIGNED ENTRY/ORDER SENT TO COURT
Date: April 03, 2024PAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #278391
Date: April 02, 2024UNSIGNED ENTRY/ORDER SENT TO COURT (NOT SIGNED PER MAGISTRATE ALLISON)
Date: April 03, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT WITH COPY OF COMPLAINT | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT - MATTER SET FOR STATUS CONFERENCE TEMPORARY ON TUESDAY MAY 21 2024 AT 9:00 AM | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED BY ATTY LYNN SFARA BRUNO | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 04/03/2024 CASE NUMBER PENDING | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE FILED BY ATTY LYNN SFARA BRUNO | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | UNSIGNED ENTRY/ORDER SENT TO COURT | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | UNSIGNED ENTRY/ORDER SENT TO COURT (NOT SIGNED PER MAGISTRATE ALLISON) | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | JUDGE WASHAM, SCOTT A: ASSIGNED | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | DOMESTIC RELATIONS CASE DESIGNATION SHEET FILED BY ATTY LYNN SFARA BRUNO | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PROPERTY AND DEBT FOR MELISSA NEWTON FILED BY ATTY LYNN SFARA BRUNO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.