Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Stratton, Corey, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Stratton, Melissa, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Beth Miller presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 23, 2007 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions470 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time470 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service PROOF OF SERVICE [912310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
August 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service PROOF OF SERVICE [912310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order 914210-Order Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service ORDER [914210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 913610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [913610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion 922210-Motion; Cory Stratton vs. Melissa Stratton Motion OSC Details: 921210 - Child Support ; Judge: J21197 Langhorne Monique Judge: Langhorne, Monique |
|
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Income and Expense 933610-Income and Expense Filed/Issued By: 912310 - Petitioner INCOME AND EXPENSE [933610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER [912310] |
|
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion 912710-Motion Motion/OSC Detail: 921210 - Child Support Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service MOTION [912710] Motion: CHILD SUPPORT [921210] Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
May 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing 915310-Hearing: Review; Cory Stratton vs. Melissa Stratton ; Judge: J21460 Williams Michael Additional Info : support Judge: Williams, Michael |
|
May 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order 913520-Stipulation and Order Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service STIPULATION AND ORDER [913520] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
February 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service PROOF OF SERVICE [912310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.