Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na filed a(n) Judgement Docket case in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Howard, Honorable J. Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryJudgement Docket |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Transfer to Judge Howard | |
January 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 01/02/2015 Service: COPY BY ORDINARY MAIL Method: SERVICE BY ORDINARY MAIL Cost Per: $5.00 MIDDLETOWN MUNICIPAL COURT ONE DONHAM PLAZA MIDDLETOWN, OH 45042 Tracking No: 1000762765 | |
January 02, 2015 | Docket Event | COPY BY ORDINARY MAIL ISSUED. COPY MAILED Sent on: 01/02/2015 08:59:41.84 | |
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Certificate of Judgment filed. Receipt: 739103 Date: 12/30/2014 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.