Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Al Xenia Operations L L C filed a(n) Judgement Docket case in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Pater, Honorable Charles L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryJudgement Docket |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
|
Certificate of Judgment filed. Receipt: 739076 Date: 12/30/2014
Date: December 29, 2014COPY BY ORDINARY MAIL ISSUED. COPY MAILED Sent on: 01/02/2015 08:51:50.67
Date: January 02, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event | (Cost Clerk's note ; for Costing a Satisfaction) | |
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION AND RELEASE OF LIEN FILED PATER, J Receipt: 761510 Date: 06/30/2015 | |
May 22, 2015 | Docket Event | FUNDS ON DEPOSIT FOR COURT COST. (PENDING SIGNATURE OF SATISFACTION) Receipt: 757127 Date: 05/22/2015 | |
May 20, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO TERMINATE GARNISHMENT ORDER FILED PATER, J Attorney: KECK, JILL A (0071053) | |
May 19, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO TERMINATE GARNISHMENT ORDER FILED Attorney: KECK, JILL A (0071053) | |
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY/LAW FIRM DEPOSIT REFUND CHECK ISSUED TO WELTMAN WEINBERG AND REIS CO LPA | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURN RECEIPT OF CERTIFIED MAIL OF Method : SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL Issued : 02/13/2015 Service : GARNISHEE COPY BY CERTIFIED MAIL Served : Return : 02/23/2015 On : AL XENIA OPERATIONS L L C Signed By : SL Reason : CERTIFIED MAIL SERVICE SUCCESSFUL Comment : NO SERVICE DATE Tracking # : L000338137 | |
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 02/13/2015 Service: DEBTOR COPY OF GARNISHMENT Method: SERVICE BY ORDINARY MAIL Cost Per: $5.00 WILSON, DAVYNNE 5334 VINE ST MIDDLETOWN, OH 45042 Tracking No: 1000767887 Receipt: 747666 Date: 03/06/2015 | |
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event | COPY OF GARNISHMENT ORDER ISSUED. GARNISHEE COPIES ISSUED BY CERT MAIL Sent on: 02/13/2015 13:08:19.01 | |
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event | COPY OF GARNISHMENT ORDER ISSUED. DEBTOR COPY ISSUED BY MAIL Sent on: 02/13/2015 15:59:55.36 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.