Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Discover Bank filed a(n) Judgement Docket case in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Michael Oster presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryJudgement Docket |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
|
COPY BY ORDINARY MAIL ISSUED. COPY MAILED Sent on: 01/05/2015 15:52:35.65
Date: January 05, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Transfer to Judge Michael Oster | |
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event | COPY BY ORDINARY MAIL ISSUED. COPY MAILED Sent on: 01/05/2015 15:52:35.65 | |
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 01/05/2015 Service: COPY BY ORDINARY MAIL Method: SERVICE BY ORDINARY MAIL Cost Per: $5.00 MIDDLETOWN MUNICIPAL COURT CIVIL DIVISION ONE DONHAM PLAZA MIDDLETOWN, OH 45042 Tracking No: 1000763248 | |
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Certificate of Judgment filed. Receipt: 739023 Date: 12/30/2014 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.