Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Judgement Docket case in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Howard, Honorable J. Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryJudgement Docket |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
|
COPY BY ORDINARY MAIL ISSUED. COPY MAILED Sent on: 01/05/2015 15:49:34.62
Date: January 05, 2015Certificate of Judgment filed. Receipt: 738998 Date: 12/30/2014
Date: December 29, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Transfer to Judge Howard | |
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event | COPY BY ORDINARY MAIL ISSUED. COPY MAILED Sent on: 01/05/2015 15:49:34.62 | |
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 01/05/2015 Service: COPY BY ORDINARY MAIL Method: SERVICE BY ORDINARY MAIL Cost Per: $5.00 BUTLER COUNTY COURT AREA II 101 HIGH ST HAMILTON, OH 45011 Tracking No: 1000763243 | |
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Certificate of Judgment filed. Receipt: 738998 Date: 12/30/2014 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.