Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Foerst, John N filed a(n) Judgement Docket case in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Muench-McElfresh, Honorable Jennifer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2014 |
CategoryJudgement Docket |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT ISSUED. NOTICE OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT Sent on: 03/13/2015 12:14:01.97 | |
March 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 03/13/2015 Service: NOTICE FOR FOREIGN JUDGMENT Method: SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL Cost Per: $8.00 GINTER, MARCUS 4613 BRIGHTON LN WEST CHESTER, OH 45069 Tracking No: L000339623 | |
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF JUDGEMENT ISSUED. CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT FOR LIEN ISSUED Sent on: 01/05/2015 08:32:42.75 | |
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 01/05/2015 Service: CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT Method: SERVICE BY ORDINARY MAIL Cost Per: $5.00 HAGGARD, GUY S GRAY ROBINSON P A 301 EAST PINE ST SUITE 1400 ORLANDO, FL 32801 Tracking No: 1000762992 | |
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event | FOREIGN CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT LIEN AND ALL OTHER PLEADINGS ATTACHED Receipt: 738721 Date: 12/26/2014 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.