Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Meaux, Vanderleun, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Potts, Randall, in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with HALCOMB, MARGOT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 08/18/2022 Service: FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER Method: SERVICE BY ORDINARY MAIL Cost Per: $5.00 MEAUX, VANDERLEUN 3180 PRESERVE LANE UNIT 1A CINCINNATI, OH 45239 Tracking No: 1001028712 MEAUX, VANDERLEUN c/o ATTY: SCHREIBER, SUSAN M 4050 EXECUTIVE PARK DRIVE SUITE 420 CINCINNATI, OH 45241 Tracking No: 1001028713 POTTS, RANDALL 1715 W BALTIMORE STREET BALTIMORE, MD 21223 Tracking No: 1001028714 | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER FILED AND NOTICE issued all parties and counsel of record FINAL APPEALABLES Sent on: 08/18/2022 11:32:23.05 | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | ENTRY AFFIRMING MAGISTRATE'S DECISION DATED: 7-28-2022 FILED. FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER ISSUED PURSUANT ORC. | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | CSEA FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS TO TERMINATE THE CHILD SUPPORT ORDER FILED | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | MAGISTRATE'S DECISION; EMANCIPATION OF MINOR CHILD FILED RICE, M | |
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | DEPOSIT REFUND CHECK ISSUED TO VANDERLEUN MEAUX PLAINTIFF (ON DEPOSIT FUNDS RECEIVED 12/29/14. | |
July 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 07/28/2015 Service: CERTIFIED COPY OF DECREE OF DIVORCE Method: SERVICE BY ORDINARY MAIL Cost Per: $5.00 MEAUX, VANDERLEUN 4 CAMELOT CT # 708 FAIRFIELD, OH 45014 Tracking No: 1000785891 MEAUX, VANDERLEUN c/o ATTY: SCHREIBER, SUSAN M 11137 MAIN STREET CINCINNATI, OH 45241 Tracking No: 1000785892 POTTS, RANDALL 1715 W BALTIMORE STREET BALTIMORE, MD 21223 Tracking No: 1000785893 Receipt: 854273 Date: 10/19/2017 | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | COST FOR DECREE WITH CHILD ABSTRACT & STENO FEE Receipt: 854273 Date: 10/19/2017 | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | COST SPLIT BETWEEN PARTIES | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | COPIES TO ATTORNEYS AND/OR PARTIES OF RECORD ISSUED. CERTIFIED DECREE OF DIVORCE Sent on: 07/28/2015 14:50:06.19 Receipt: 854273 Date: 10/19/2017 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.