Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Nold, Richele A, filed a(n) Divorce With Children case against Nold, Michael W, in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with CARTER-SCHNEIDER, BARBARA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 05/19/2021 Service: FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER Method: SERVICE BY ORDINARY MAIL Cost Per: $5.00 NOLD, RICHELE A 7899 PINNACLE POINT DR WEST CHESTER, OH 45069 Tracking No: 1000991395 NOLD, RICHELE A c/o ATTY: ALEXANDER, CHRISTOPHER M ALEXANDER, WEBB & KINMAN LLC 423 READING ROAD MASON, OH 45040 Tracking No: 1000991396 NOLD, MICHAEL W 7315 CHARTER CUP LANE WEST CHESTER, OH 45069 Tracking No: 1000991397 NOLD, MICHAEL W c/o ATTY: KRAEMER, BRADLEY M 4841-A RIALTO RD WEST CHESTER, OH 45069 Tracking No: 1000991398 | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER FILED AND NOTICE issued all parties and counsel of record FINAL APPEALABLES Sent on: 05/19/2021 09:26:57.15 | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | ENTRY AFFIRMING MAGISTRATE'S DECISION FILED ON 4/30/2021; FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER FILED CARTER, J | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | MAGISTRATE'S DECISION; EMANCIPATION OF MINOR CHILD FILED KIRSCHIEPER, M | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CSEA FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS TO TERMINATE THE CHILD SUPPORT ORDER FILED | |
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER FILED AND NOTICE issued all parties and counsel of record FINAL APPEALABLES Sent on: 05/08/2020 10:54:14.33 | |
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 05/08/2020 Service: FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER Method: SERVICE BY ORDINARY MAIL Cost Per: $5.00 NOLD, RICHELE A 8299 GLENHAVEN COURT CINTI, OH 45241 Tracking No: 1000967777 NOLD, RICHELE A c/o ATTY: ALEXANDER, CHRISTOPHER M ALEXANDER, WEBB & KINMAN LLC 423 READING ROAD MASON, OH 45040 Tracking No: 1000967778 NOLD, MICHAEL W 7315 CHARTER CUP LANE WEST CHESTER, OH 45069 Tracking No: 1000967779 NOLD, MICHAEL W c/o ATTY: KRAEMER, BRADLEY M 4841-A RIALTO RD WEST CHESTER, OH 45069 Tracking No: 1000967780 | |
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event | ENTRY AFFIRMING MAGISTRATE'S DECISION DATED: 4/13/2020 AND FILED ON 4/20/2020; FINAL APPEALABLE RODER FILED CARTER, J | |
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event | CSEA ATTORNEY INITIATED ENTRY AND ORDER FILED. (DR 718) FILED KIRSCHSIEPER, M | |
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event | CSEA NOTICE TO THE DOMESTIC RELATIONS COURT COMPLIANCE OFFICE FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.