Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Harris, Teresa A, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Harris, Ricky L, in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with KESSLER, EVA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2008 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedMay 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2009 | Docket Event | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER FILED KESSLER, J | |
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event | DEPOSIT REFUND CHECK ISSUED TO CARMELLA,BRADLEY,ATTY Receipt: 431788 Date: 07/24/2008 | |
July 07, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ON 08/07/2008 | |
July 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 07/07/2008 Service: CERTIFIED COPY OF DECREE OF DIVORCE Method: SERVICE BY ORDINARY MAIL Cost Per: $ 4.00 HARRIS, TERESA A c/o ATTY: CARMELLA, BRADYLEY R 6 SOUTH SECOND STREET SUITE 821 HAMILTON, OH 45011 Tracking No: 1000410090 HARRIS, TERESA A 2253 CANARY LANE FAIRFIELD, OH 45014 Tracking No: 1000410091 HARRIS, RICKY L 2253 CANARY LANE FAIRFIELD, OH 45014 Tracking No: 1000410092 HARRIS, RICKY L c/o ATTY: PATER, GERALD L 315 S FRONT ST HAMILTON, OH 45011 Tracking No: 1000410093 Receipt: 431788 Date: 07/24/2008 | |
July 07, 2008 | Docket Event | COPIES TO ATTORNEYS AND/OR PARTIES OF RECORD ISSUED. CERTIFIED DECREE OF DIVORCE Sent on: 07/07/2008 15:49:47 Receipt: 431788 Date: 07/24/2008 | |
July 03, 2008 | Docket Event | DECREE OF DIVORCE FILED NOTICE OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO ALL PARTIES BY MAIL FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER FILED KESSLER, J Receipt: 431788 Date: 07/24/2008 | |
July 03, 2008 | Docket Event | COSTS TO BE PAID BY THE DEFENDANT | |
July 03, 2008 | Docket Event | COST FOR DECREE WITH CHILD ABSTRACT & STENO FEE Receipt: 431788 Date: 07/24/2008 | |
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER TO APPEAR FOR SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO FILE DECREE FILED KESSLER, J Receipt: 431788 Date: 07/24/2008 | |
May 09, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WAIVE MANDATORY EDUCATION AND ORDER FILED KESSLER,J Receipt: 431788 Date: 07/24/2008 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.