Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cincinnati Insurance Company, filed a(n) Subrogation - Insurance case against Freeman, Benjamin J, Holden, in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Oster Jr., Honorable Michael A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 24, 2023 |
CategorySubrogation (C) |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
Matter TypeSubrogation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF, CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY'S, MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL AND TO REACTIVATE THE INSTANT CASE FILED Attorney: SCHMIDT, MATTHEW M (0072898) | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | RULE 41(B) DISMISSAL ORDER FILED OSTER, J | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED Attorney: PRO SE (AMY HOLDEN) | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT BENJAMIN J FREEMAN ONLY FILED Attorney: SCHMIDT, MATTHEW M (0072898) | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT Attorney: SCHMIDT, MATTHEW M (0072898) | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER on behalf of : AMY HOLDEN FILED Attorney: PRO SE (AMY HOLDEN) | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RETURNED UPON BENJAMIN J FREEMAN AND FILED ON 06/27/2023 | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 06/27/2023 Service: SUMMONS BY ORDINARY MAIL Method: SERVICE BY ORDINARY MAIL Cost Per: $5.00 FREEMAN, BENJAMIN J 3297 EAST SMOKY MOUNTAIN DRIVE LAWRENCEBURG, IN 47025 Tracking No: 1001062554 | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT BY ORDINARY MAIL ISSUED. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED. SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT BY ORDINARY MAIL Sent on: 06/27/2023 09:00:36.42 | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | PRECIPE FOR SERVICE Attorney: SCHMIDT, MATTHEW M (0072898) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.