Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Live Wire Partners Llc, filed a(n) Injunction -Remedy (H) case against Beyersdoerfer, Charles, Chuck Beyers Media Llc, in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Spaeth, Honorable Keith M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSpaeth, Honorable Keith M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2022 |
CategoryInjunction -Remedy (H) |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY/LAW FIRM DEPOSIT REFUND CHECK ISSUED TO GREG D PORTER | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | (COST CLERK'S NOTE ; FOR ASSIGNING / APPLYING COST FOR DISMISSAL ENTRY) | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | STIPULATED DISMISSAL FILED Attorney: PORTER, GREG D (0089516) Receipt: 1037908 Date: 12/07/2022 | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE PLEAD FILED Attorney: COPETAS, THEODORE C (0068419) | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | ( COST CLERK'S NOTE FOR ASSIGNING / APPLYING COST FOR FUNDS ON DEPOSIT FOR COURT COST 9/16/22) | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN RECEIPT OF CERTIFIED MAIL OF Method : E-CERTIFIED MAIL (w/ ERR) Issued : 09/20/2022 Service : SUMMONS BY CERTIFIED MAIL Served : 09/22/2022 Return : 09/27/2022 On : BEYERSDOERFER, CHARLES Signed By : ILLEGIBLE Reason : CERTIFIED MAIL SERVICE SUCCESSFUL Comment : Tracking # : Z000056807 | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN RECEIPT OF CERTIFIED MAIL OF Method : E-CERTIFIED MAIL (w/ ERR) Issued : 09/20/2022 Service : SUMMONS BY CERTIFIED MAIL Served : 09/22/2022 Return : 09/27/2022 On : CHUCK BEYERS MEDIA LLC Signed By : ILLEGIBLE Reason : CERTIFIED MAIL SERVICE SUCCESSFUL Comment : Tracking # : Z000056808 | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC CERTIFIED MAIL COVERSHEET (IMPB BARCODE) Receipt: 1031885 Date: 09/30/2022 | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL ISSUED. SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL Sent on: 09/20/2022 13:37:36.92 Receipt: 1031885 Date: 09/30/2022 | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 09/20/2022 Service: SUMMONS BY CERTIFIED MAIL Method: E-CERTIFIED MAIL (w/ ERR) Cost Per: $0.00 BEYERSDOERFER, CHARLES 413 CHARLBERTH DRIVE HAMILTON, OH 45013 Tracking No: Z000056807 CHUCK BEYERS MEDIA LLC C/O STATUTORY AGENT CHARLES BEYERSDOERFER 413 CHARLBERTH DRIVE HAMILTON, OH 45013 Tracking No: Z000056808 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.