Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Hutsenpiller Contractors Inc, Liberty Firehouse Storage Llc, filed a(n) Admin Appeals - Administrative case against Board Of Building Appeals State Of Ohio, Klussman, Ethan, Liberty Township Board Of Trustees, in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Stephens, Honorable Greg S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 12, 2019 |
CategoryAdministrative Appealto Common Pleas (F) |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
Matter TypeAdmin Appeals |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED STEPHES, J Receipt: 963263 Date: 09/01/2020
Date: October 23, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY/LAW FIRM DEPOSIT REFUND CHECK ISSUED TO LINDHORST AND DREIDAME CO LPA | |
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | FUNDS ON DEPOSIT FOR COURT COST. Receipt: 964418 Date: 09/14/2020 | |
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT COST DUE ISSUED. NOTICE OF COURT COSTS DUE Sent on: 08/20/2020 10:08:45.17 | |
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 08/20/2020 Service: NOTICE OF COURT COST DUE Method: SERVICE BY ORDINARY MAIL Cost Per: $5.00 HUTSENPILLER CONTRACTORS INC C/O BOB HUTSENPILLER LAKOTA EAST COMMERCE CENTRE 7904 LIBERTY ONE DR LIBERTY TWP, OH 45044 Tracking No: 1000973567 HUTSENPILLER CONTRACTORS INC c/o ATTY: HURLBURT, CHRISTOPHER H LINDHORST & DREIDAME CO L P A 312 WALNUT ST SUITE 2300 CINCINNATI, OH 45202 Tracking No: 1000973568 Receipt: 963263 Date: 09/01/2020 | |
December 03, 2019 |
STATUS REPORT HEARING General Division Court Govt Serv Ctr 3rd floor Judge: Gehr, Daniel W. |
||
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED STEPHES, J Receipt: 963263 Date: 09/01/2020 | |
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT ADMINISTRATION OFFICE HAS SCHEDULED: Event: STATUS REPORT HEARING Date: 12/03/2019 Time: 10:30 am Judge: Gehr, Daniel W. Location: General Division Court Govt Serv Ctr 3rd floor Result: VACATED | |
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURN RECEIPT OF CERTIFIED MAIL OF Method : SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL Issued : 09/11/2019 Service : NOTICE OF FILING OF TRANSCRIPT Served : 09/13/2019 Return : 09/18/2019 On : SHERMAN, CARLY M Signed By : ANDY Reason : CERTIFIED MAIL SERVICE SUCCESSFUL Comment : Tracking # : L000388925 | |
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURN RECEIPT OF CERTIFIED MAIL OF Method : SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL Issued : 09/11/2019 Service : NOTICE OF FILING OF TRANSCRIPT Served : 09/16/2019 Return : 09/18/2019 On : BOARD OF BUILDING APPEALS STATE OF OHIO Signed By : HENRY FRANK Reason : CERTIFIED MAIL SERVICE SUCCESSFUL Comment : Tracking # : L000388926 | |
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURN RECEIPT OF CERTIFIED MAIL OF Method : SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL Issued : 09/11/2019 Service : NOTICE OF FILING OF TRANSCRIPT Served : 09/12/2019 Return : 09/18/2019 On : LIBERTY TOWNSHIP BOARD OF TRUSTEES Signed By : ILLEGIBLE Reason : CERTIFIED MAIL SERVICE SUCCESSFUL Comment : Tracking # : L000388924 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.