Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Stephens, Honorable Greg S.K4620063000131 - K4620063000135 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2018 |
CategoryForeclosure (E) |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE THE PLTF FILED Attorney: CLUNK, ETHAN J (0095546)
Date: January 09, 2019FINAL JUDICIAL REPORT FILED
Date: March 06, 2019Complaint & Filing fee for each cause of action ORC 2303.20(A). Receipt: 900025 Date: 12/20/2018
Date: December 20, 2018ORDER SUBSTITUTING THE PLTF FILED STEPHENS, J Receipt: 941978 Date: 01/17/2020
Date: January 10, 2019CIVIL DOCKET SHEET DESIGNATING CATAGORY OF CAUSE, FILED
Date: December 20, 2018ELECTRONIC CERTIFIED MAIL COVERSHEET (IMPB BARCODE) Receipt: 900972 Date: 01/03/2019
Date: December 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ADDRESS CHANGE FILED Attorney: INFANTE, LAURA C (0082050E) | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY/LAW FIRM DEPOSIT REFUND CHECK ISSUED TO | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY/LAW FIRM ESCROW DEPOSIT REFUND CHECK ISSUED TO CLUNK HOOSE CO LPA | |
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF STAY DUE TO BANKRUPTCY FILED STEPHENS, J Receipt: 941978 Date: 01/17/2020 | |
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT ADMINISTRATION OFFICE HAS SCHEDULED: Event: DEFAULT JUDGMENT HEARING Date: 06/18/2019 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: Gehr, Daniel W. Location: General Division Court Govt Serv Ctr 3rd floor Result: VACATED | |
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILED Attorney: CLUNK, ETHAN J (0095546) | |
March 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 03/15/2019 Service: NOTICE OF SERVICE FAILURE BY CERTIFIED MAIL Method: SERVICE BY ORDINARY MAIL Cost Per: $5.00 FIFTH THIRD BANK c/o ATTY: CLUNK, ETHAN J 4500 COURTHOUSE BLVD STE 400 STOW, OH 44224 Tracking No: 1000927032 Receipt: 941978 Date: 01/17/2020 | |
March 15, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAILURE OF CERTIFIED MAIL SERVICE ISSUED. FAILURE BY CERTIFIED MAIL Sent on: 03/15/2019 09:28:13.37 | |
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURN ON FAILURE OF CERTIFIED MAIL: Method : E-CERTIFIED MAIL (w/ ERR) Issued : 12/27/2018 Service : SUMMONS ON FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL Served : Return : 03/12/2019 On : PENNINGTON, UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JASON L Signed By : Reason : FAILURE OF CERTIFIED MAIL Comment : UNCLAIMED, UNABLE TO FORWARD. Tracking # : Z000015397 | |
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 03/11/2019 Service: NOTICE OF SERVICE FAILURE BY CERTIFIED MAIL Method: SERVICE BY ORDINARY MAIL Cost Per: $5.00 FIFTH THIRD BANK c/o ATTY: CLUNK, ETHAN J 4500 COURTHOUSE BLVD STE 400 STOW, OH 44224 Tracking No: 1000926503 Receipt: 941978 Date: 01/17/2020 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.