Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Muench-McElfresh, Honorable JenniferP6431-026-000-039 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2018 |
CategoryForeclosure (E) |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
PRELIMINARY JUDICAL REPORT FILED Attorney: JOHNSTONE, RICARDO (0090721)
Date: December 19, 2018ELECTRONIC CERTIFIED MAIL COVERSHEET (IMPB BARCODE) Receipt: 900946 Date: 01/02/2019
Date: December 21, 2018CIVIL DOCKET SHEET DESIGNATING CATAGORY OF CAUSE, FILED
Date: December 19, 2018Complaint & Filing fee for each cause of action ORC 2303.20(A). Receipt: 899840 Date: 12/19/2018
Date: December 19, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY/LAW FIRM DEPOSIT REFUND CHECK ISSUED TO WELTMAN WEINBERG AND REIS CO LPA | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | RECORDER FEE CHECK ISSUED TO BUTLER COUNTY RECORDER | |
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL FORECLOSURE COST RECEIVED Receipt: 945345 Date: 02/14/2020 | |
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event | ENTRY CONFIRMING SALE AND ORDERING DEED AND DISTRIBUTION FILED MCELFRESH, J Receipt: 945483 Date: 02/18/2020 | |
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FILED Attorney: HOEN, BENJAMIN N (0077704) | |
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING SALE AND ORDERING DEED AND DISTRIBUTION FILED Attorney: HOEN, BENJAMIN N (0077704) | |
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE DOCKET SHEET ISSUED. CASE DOCKET SHEET Sent on: 08/26/2019 14:55:12.83 Receipt: 945483 Date: 02/18/2020 | |
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 08/26/2019 Service: CASE DOCKET SHEET Method: SERVICE BY ORDINARY MAIL Cost Per: $5.00 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCATION c/o ATTY: JOHNSTONE, RICARDO 525 VINE ST., SUITE 800 CINCINNATI, OH 45202 Tracking No: 1000943825 Receipt: 945483 Date: 02/18/2020 | |
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event | [ Clerk's memo ] REVIEWED 08/23/19 ROS AND DOCKET | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | ESTIMATED RECORDER FEE $58.00 SEE PMNT 02/18/2020 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.