Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
J H Portfolio Debt Equitie, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Ellis, Judy, in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with ONEY, Honorable PATRICIA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryCollection Of Account (H) |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
Matter TypeCollections |
Complaint & Filing fee for each cause of action ORC 2303.20(A). Receipt: 738847 Date: 12/29/2014
Date: December 29, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event | "STENOGRAPHER" (TAPE TRANSCRIPTION) FEE Receipt: 890799 Date: 09/26/2018 | |
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED ONEY, J Receipt: 890799 Date: 09/26/2018 | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FILED | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED Attorney: HACKING, TIMOTHY J (0073790) | |
May 05, 2015 |
STATUS REPORT HEARING General Division Court Govt Serv Ctr 3rd floor Judge: ONEY, Honorable PATRICIA |
||
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event | COPY BY ORDINARY MAIL ISSUED. COPY MAILED Sent on: 03/17/2015 14:57:06.28 | |
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 03/17/2015 Service: COPY BY ORDINARY MAIL Method: SERVICE BY ORDINARY MAIL Cost Per: $5.00 ELLIS, JUDY 2424 BENNINGHOFEN AVE HAMILTON, OH 45015 Tracking No: 1000770945 Receipt: 890799 Date: 09/26/2018 | |
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAILURE OF CERTIFIED MAIL SERVICE ISSUED. FAILURE BY CERTIFIED MAIL Sent on: 02/20/2015 13:15:46.73 | |
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 02/20/2015 Service: NOTICE OF SERVICE FAILURE BY CERTIFIED MAIL Method: SERVICE BY ORDINARY MAIL Cost Per: $5.00 J H PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIE c/o ATTY: BUNCE, MARTIN LAW OFFICES OF BERNDT & ASSOCIATES 25651 DETROIT ROAD # 203 WESTLAKE, OH 44145 Tracking No: 1000768396 Receipt: 890799 Date: 09/26/2018 | |
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURN ON FAILURE OF CERTIFIED MAIL: Method : SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL Issued : 01/05/2015 Service : SUMMONS BY CERTIFIED MAIL Served : Return : 02/19/2015 On : ELLIS, JUDY Signed By : Reason : FAILURE OF CERTIFIED MAIL Comment : UNCLAIMED Tracking # : L000335814 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.