Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Muench-McElfresh, Honorable JenniferD2020119000032 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2014 |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
|
Complaint & Filing fee for each cause of action ORC 2303.20(A). Receipt: 738840 Date: 12/29/2014
Date: December 26, 2014MOTION TO DISMISS FILED Attorney: HOOSE, ROBERT R (0074544)
Date: May 15, 2015ANSWER AND REQUEST FOR MEDIATION FILED Attorney: PRO SE (JAMIE HAMM AND JOSE PALACIO)
Date: January 27, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY/LAW FIRM DEPOSIT REFUND CHECK ISSUED TO CLUNK PAISLEY HOOSE CO LPA, ATTY | |
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event | (COST CLERK'S NOTE ; FOR ASSIGNING / APPLYING COST FOR DISMISSAL ENTRY 5.26.15) | |
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY/LAW FIRM ESCROW DEPOSIT REFUND CHECK ISSUED TO CLUNK PAISLEY HOOSE CO LPA, ATTY | |
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING CASE FILED MUENCH-MCELFRESH, J Attorney: HOOSE, ROBERT R (0074544) Receipt: 833622 Date: 04/07/2017 | |
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS FILED Attorney: HOOSE, ROBERT R (0074544) | |
March 16, 2015 | Docket Event | COURT ADMINISTRATION OFFICE HAS SCHEDULED: Event: STATUS REPORT HEARING Date: 05/27/2015 Time: 8:40 am Judge: Muench-McElfresh, Honorable Jennifer Location: General Division Court Govt Serv Ctr 3rd floor Result: VACATED | |
March 16, 2015 | Docket Event | COURT ADMINISTRATION OFFICE ISSUED NOTICE TO REPORT NOTICE TO REPORT Sent on: 03/16/2015 13:35:18.47 Receipt: 833622 Date: 04/07/2017 | |
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 03/09/2015 Service: NOTICE OF SERVICE FAILURE BY CERTIFIED MAIL Method: SERVICE BY ORDINARY MAIL Cost Per: $5.00 H S B C BANK U S A NATIONAL ASSOCIATION c/o ATTY: TERRY, JULIE A THE LAW OFFICE OF JOHN D. CLUNK CO LPA 4500 COURTHOUSE BLVD. SUITE 400 STOW, OH 44224 Tracking No: 1000770288 Receipt: 833622 Date: 04/07/2017 | |
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAILURE OF CERTIFIED MAIL SERVICE ISSUED. FAILURE BY CERTIFIED MAIL Sent on: 03/09/2015 13:57:45.66 | |
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURN ON FAILURE OF CERTIFIED MAIL: Method : SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL Issued : 01/05/2015 Service : SUMMONS ON FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL Served : Return : 03/09/2015 On : S P & P INVESTMENTS INC Signed By : Reason : FAILURE OF CERTIFIED MAIL Comment : UNCLAIMED Tracking # : L000335752 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.