Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
B M O Harris Bank F A, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Israel, Ronald S, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Provident National Bank, Smith, Unknown Heirs Of Walter W, in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Pater, Honorable Charles L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2014 |
CategoryForeclosure (E) |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event | RECORDER FEE CHECK ISSUED TO BUTLER COUNTY RECORDER | |
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY/LAW FIRM DEPOSIT REFUND CHECK ISSUED TO ROBERT J OLENDER | |
January 14, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL FORECLOSURE COST RECEIVED Receipt: 783651 Date: 01/14/2016 | |
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event | NUNC PRO TUNC JUDGMENT ENTRY FILED PATER, J Attorney: OLENDER, ROBERT J (0016245) Receipt: 783726 Date: 01/15/2016 | |
October 28, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER FILED AND NOTICE issued all parties and counsel of record FINAL APPEALABLES Sent on: 10/28/2015 10:49:23.14 Receipt: 783726 Date: 01/15/2016 | |
October 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 10/28/2015 Service: FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER Method: SERVICE BY ORDINARY MAIL Cost Per: $5.00 B M O HARRIS BANK F A M AND I BANK F S B, SUCCESSOR 770 N WATER STREET MILWAUKEE, WI 53202 Tracking No: 1000795973 B M O HARRIS BANK F A c/o ATTY: OLENDER, ROBERT J 22050 MASTICK ROAD FAIRVIEW PARK, OH 44126 Tracking No: 1000795974 ISRAEL, RONALD S 782 N SHUTTLESWORTH WAY A CINCINNATI, OH 45229 Tracking No: 1000795975 PROVIDENT NATIONAL BANK 295 MAIN STREET TILTON, NH 03276 Tracking No: 1000795976 MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC 1818 LIBRARY STREET SUITE 300 RESTON, VA 20190 Tracking No: 1000795977 Receipt: 783726 Date: 01/15/2016 | |
October 26, 2015 | Docket Event | JOURNAL ENTRY, CONFIRMATION OF SALE AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION (FINAL APPELABL ORDER) FILED PATER, J Receipt: 783726 Date: 01/15/2016 | |
October 26, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF POSTING/PUBLICATION FILED | |
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CONFIRM SHERIFF'S SALE AND FOR ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF SALE PROCEEDS FILED Attorney: OLENDER, ROBERT J (0016245) | |
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FILED Attorney: OLENDER, ROBERT J (0016245) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.