Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Noah E. Powers II presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2014 |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
|
MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ANSWER INSTANTER FILED Attorney: RODIER, IAN H (0041889)
Date: March 31, 2015ORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED POWERS, J Receipt: 841051 Date: 06/26/2017
Date: June 22, 2015JOINT MOTION FOR ENLARGMENT OF TIME FILED Attorney: CARLETON, MICHAEL E (0083352)
Date: September 15, 2015ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS FILED POWERS, J Receipt: 841051 Date: 06/26/2017
Date: November 30, 2015ORDER DISMISSIG PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS FILED POWERS, J Receipt: 841051 Date: 06/26/2017
Date: December 07, 2015Complaint & Filing fee for each cause of action ORC 2303.20(A). Receipt: 738711 Date: 12/26/2014
Date: December 26, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | (COST CLERK'S NOTE ; FOR ASSIGNING / APPLYING COST FOR DISMISSAL ENTRY 11.30.15) | |
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY/LAW FIRM DEPOSIT REFUND CHECK ISSUED TO MANLEY DEAS KOCHALSKI LLC | |
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event | (COST CLERK'S NOTE ; FOR ASSIGNING / APPLYING COST FOR DISMISSAL ENTRY 6.22.15) | |
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event | ESCROW DEPOSIT REFUND CHECK ISSUED TO MANLEY DEAS KOCHALSKI LLC | |
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSIG PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS FILED POWERS, J Receipt: 841051 Date: 06/26/2017 | |
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS UNDER RULE 41(A)(2) FILED Attorney: CARLETON, MICHAEL E (0083352) | |
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS FILED POWERS, J Receipt: 841051 Date: 06/26/2017 | |
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event | (FAXED) MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS UNDER RULE 41(A)(2) FILED Attorney: CARLETON, MICHAEL E (0083352) | |
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER ENLARGING TIME FILED POWERS, J Attorney: CARLETON, MICHAEL E (0083352) Receipt: 841051 Date: 06/26/2017 | |
September 15, 2015 | Docket Event | JOINT MOTION FOR ENLARGMENT OF TIME FILED Attorney: CARLETON, MICHAEL E (0083352) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.