Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Hedric, Honorable Craig D. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2014 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
|
Complaint & Filing fee for each cause of action ORC 2303.20(A). Receipt: 738498 Date: 12/23/2014
Date: December 23, 2014NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED Attorney: CONESE, MARK ANTHONY (0004637)
Date: June 30, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY/LAW FIRM DEPOSIT REFUND CHECK ISSUED TO MARK ANTHONY CONESE | |
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED Attorney: CONESE, MARK ANTHONY (0004637) | |
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event | COURT ADMINISTRATION OFFICE HAS SCHEDULED: The following event: STATUS REPORT HEARING scheduled for 04/07/2015 at 9:10 am has been rescheduled as follows: Event: STATUS REPORT HEARING Date: 06/16/2015 Time: 8:40 am Judge: HEDRIC, Honorable CRAIG D Location: General Division Court Govt Serv Ctr 4th floor Result: SEE NOTES | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | COURT ADMINISTRATION OFFICE HAS SCHEDULED: Event: STATUS REPORT HEARING Date: 04/07/2015 Time: 9:10 am Judge: HEDRIC, Honorable CRAIG D Location: General Division Court Govt Serv Ctr 4th floor Result: CONTINUED | |
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURN RECEIPT OF CERTIFIED MAIL OF Method : SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL Issued : 01/02/2015 Service : SUMMONS BY CERTIFIED MAIL Served : 01/06/2015 Return : 01/08/2015 On : HENZ, GARY Signed By : GARY HENZ Reason : CERTIFIED MAIL SERVICE SUCCESSFUL Comment : Tracking # : L000335691 | |
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURN RECEIPT OF CERTIFIED MAIL OF Method : SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL Issued : 01/02/2015 Service : SUMMONS BY CERTIFIED MAIL Served : 01/03/2015 Return : 01/05/2015 On : HENZ, GARY Signed By : ELLIOT HENRY Reason : CERTIFIED MAIL SERVICE SUCCESSFUL Comment : Tracking # : L000335690 | |
January 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 01/02/2015 Service: SUMMONS BY CERTIFIED MAIL Method: SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL Cost Per: $8.00 HENZ, GARY 62 PEBBLE BROOK LANE APT C HAMILTON, OH 45011 Tracking No: L000335690 HENZ, GARY C/O THE COZY COTTAGE 6456 CINCINNATI DAYTON RD LIBERTY TWP, OH 45044 Tracking No: L000335691 Receipt: 741312 Date: 01/15/2015 | |
January 02, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL ISSUED. SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL Sent on: 01/02/2015 14:46:51.87 Receipt: 741312 Date: 01/15/2015 | |
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Complaint & Filing fee for each cause of action ORC 2303.20(A). Receipt: 738498 Date: 12/23/2014 | |
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Court Computerization Fee pursuant to ORC 2303.201 (A)(1). Receipt: 738498 Date: 12/23/2014 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.