Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Barnes, David A, Barnes, Kathy A, Butler County Treasurer, State Of Ohio Department Of Taxation, in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Powers, Honorable Noah E.M5620-164-000-097 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2008 |
CategoryForeclosure (E) |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND DECREE IN FORECLOSURE FILED POWERS, J Receipt: 461173 Date: 03/03/2009
Date: February 18, 2009NOTICE OF FILING OF ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE FILED Attorney: SHRADER, REBECCA R (0076677)
Date: January 20, 2009ANSWER OF BUTLER COUNTY TREASURER AND AUDITOR FILED Attorney: ROBERTS, BOB C (0078270)
Date: January 07, 2009Complaint & Filing fee for each cause of action ORC 2303.20(A). Receipt: 451816 Date: 12/30/2008
Date: December 29, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT AND DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS FILED POWERS, J | |
September 28, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS UNDER RULE 41(A)(2) FILED Attorney: SHRADER, REBECCA R (0076677) | |
July 17, 2009 | Docket Event | DEPOSIT REFUND CHECK ISSUED TO REBECCA R SHRADER | |
July 17, 2009 | Docket Event | PUBLICATION CHECK ISSUED TO COX OHIO PUBLISHING | |
July 13, 2009 | Docket Event | SHERIFF FEE MILEAGE Receipt: 479158 Date: 07/17/2009 | |
July 13, 2009 | Docket Event | PUBLICATION FEE ENTERED FROM RETURN HAMILTON JOURNAL: $623.96 SEE PAYMENT OF 7/17/09 | |
July 13, 2009 | Docket Event | SHERIFF FEE OATH Receipt: 479158 Date: 07/17/2009 | |
July 13, 2009 | Docket Event | SHERIFF RETURN SERVICE FEE Receipt: 479158 Date: 07/17/2009 | |
July 13, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER VACATING ORDER FOR SALE AND WITHDRAW PROPERTY FROM SALE FILED POWERS ,J | |
July 13, 2009 | Docket Event | RETURN ON ORDER OF SALE WITHDRAWN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.