Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with ONEY, Honorable PATRICIA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 05, 2008 |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 04/06/2015 Service: SIXTY DAY NOTICE DESTRUCTION Method: SERVICE BY ORDINARY MAIL Cost Per: $5.00 BALSINGER, WILLIAM c/o ATTY: GATES, ROGER S P O BOX 515 HAMILTON, OH 45012 Tracking No: 1000773347 | |
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event | SIXTY-DAY NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION ISSUED. SIXTY-DAY NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION Sent on: 04/06/2015 15:19:41.27 | |
August 17, 2010 | Docket Event | SECOND A/R NOTICE SENT. COURT COSTS ARE 60 DAYS PAST DUE. HALTER, WILLIAM B was sent notice for $ 403.00 Printed on 08/17/2010 16:27:56. | |
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event | FIRST A/R NOTICE SENT. COURT COSTS ARE 30 DAYS PAST DUE. HALTER, WILLIAM B was sent notice for $ 403.00 Printed on 07/14/2010 09:33:09. | |
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event | ( COST CLERK'S NOTE FOR ASSIGNING / APPLYING COST FOR JUDGMENT FINAL ENTRY) | |
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 06/15/2010 Service: NOTICE OF COURT COST DUE Method: SERVICE BY ORDINARY MAIL Cost Per: $ 5.00 HALTER, WILLIAM B 7295 BROOKVILLE RD OXFORD, OH 45056 Tracking No: 1000531249 HALTER, WILLIAM B c/o ATTY: HYDE, RICHARD A HOLCOMB, HYDE & GMOSER, L.L.P. 311 KEY BANK BUILDING 6 SOUTH SECOND ST. HAMILTON, OH 45011 Tracking No: 1000531250 Receipt: 536271 Date: 09/08/2010 | |
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT COST DUE ISSUED. NOTICE OF COURT COSTS DUE Sent on: 06/15/2010 13:50:49 | |
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT IN CONTEMPT (FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER) FILE ONEY, J Receipt: 536271 Date: 09/08/2010 | |
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED | |
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event | "STENOGRAPHER" (TAPE TRANSCRIPTION) FEE Receipt: 536271 Date: 09/08/2010 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.