Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts with Matt C. Staley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatt C. Staley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 10, 2016 |
|
Last RefreshedJune 16, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationAllen County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event | NCOURT DEPOSIT (KIRK) Receipt: 515869 Date: 10/10/2017 | |
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Sent to Collections LISAMARIE YOUNG amount sent to collections: 207.25 | |
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | COLLECTION -CAPITAL RECOVERY FEE (30%) LISAMARIE YOUNG amount sent to collections: 207.25 | |
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Sent to Collections KIRK YOUNG amount sent to collections: 182.25 | |
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | COLLECTION -CAPITAL RECOVERY FEE (30%) KIRK YOUNG amount sent to collections: 182.25 | |
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Sent to Collections YOUNG, LISAMARIE was sent notice for $ 207.25 Printed on 09/28/2017 10:59:07.09. | |
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Sent to Collections YOUNG, KIRK was sent notice for $ 182.25 Printed on 09/28/2017 10:59:07.01. | |
August 22, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL NOTICE MAILED YOUNG, LISAMARIE was sent notice for $ 207.25 Printed on 08/22/2017 14:04:03.21. | |
August 22, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL NOTICE MAILED YOUNG, KIRK was sent notice for $ 182.25 Printed on 08/22/2017 14:04:03.00. | |
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF EXHIBITS FILED -- PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.