Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lima Memorial Health System, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Duplay, Crystal M, against Adkins, Angela C, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts with REED, JEFFREY L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREED, JEFFREY L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2022 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationAllen County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC RETURN FILED SIGNED: ILLEGIBLE SIGNATURE FOR ADKINS, ANGELA C DATE: 7/8/22 | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 07/05/2022 Service: SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRACKING NUMBER IMAGED) Method: CERTIFIED MAIL Cost Per: $10.00 ADKINS, ANGELA C 1540 LELAND AVE LIMA, OH 45805 Tracking No: 7104223016901125932 | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS, COPY OF COMPLAINT | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | CV GEN'L SPL PROJECTS FUND Receipt: 622098 Date: 07/01/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.