Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts with Jeffrey L. Reed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey L. Reed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 15, 2018 |
|
Last RefreshedJune 16, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationAllen County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event | BALANCE OF DEPOSIT TO MICHELLE POLLY-MURPHY Check Issued: 08/08/18 Check #112895 $105.00 Payable to: MICHELLE POLLY MURPHY. | |
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event | COST BILL FILED | |
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | MAILING FEES Receipt: 535030 Date: 08/07/2018 | |
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | PROVIDED COPIES MAILED TO MICHELLE POLLY MURPHY (SASE) AND ANTHONY HAYWOOD; COPIES MAILED TO LINDA HAYWOOD Receipt: 535030 Date: 08/07/2018 | |
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | CONSENT JUDGMENT ENTRY FILED Receipt: 535030 Date: 08/07/2018 | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF REPORTERS COST FILED Receipt: 535030 Date: 08/07/2018 | |
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | MAILING FEES Receipt: 535030 Date: 08/07/2018 | |
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | COPIES MAILED BY THE COURT Receipt: 535030 Date: 08/07/2018 | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | RE-ASSIGNMENT NOTICE FILED | |
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE FILED ANTHONY HAYWOOD (Defendant); |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.