Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Watkins, Eric D, filed a(n) Other Torts case against Symonds, James E, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts with CHENEY, DAVID A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCHENEY, DAVID A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2014 |
CategoryOther Torts |
Last RefreshedJune 15, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationAllen County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event | REFUND OF DEPOSIT MAILED TO ATTORNEY AARON L BENSINGER Check Issued: 01/30/15 Check #96347 $51.00 Payable to: AARON L BENSINGER. | |
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event | COST BILL FILED | |
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FILED AARON L BENSINGER (Attorney) on behalf of ERIC D WATKINS (Plaintiff) Receipt: 451556 Date: 01/27/2015 | |
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURN RECEIPT FILED SIGNED: JAMES SYMONDS, 3509 RESERVOIR RD, LIMA OHIO 45801 DATE: 12/4/2014 FILED | |
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 12/01/2014 Service: SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT Method: CERTIFIED MAIL Cost Per: $6.00 SYMONDS, JAMES E 3509 RESERVOIR RD LIMA, OH 45801 Receipt: 451556 Date: 01/27/2015 | |
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS, COPY OF COMPLAINT Receipt: 451556 Date: 01/27/2015 | |
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event | PRAECIPE FOR CERTIFIED MAIL SERVICE FILED AARON L BENSINGER (Attorney) on behalf of ERIC D WATKINS (Plaintiff) | |
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event | MAILING FEES Receipt: 451556 Date: 01/27/2015 | |
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event | COPIES MAILED TO JAMES E SYMONDS Receipt: 451556 Date: 01/27/2015 | |
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event | EMAILED COPIES TO AARON L BENSINGER Receipt: 451556 Date: 01/27/2015 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.