Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts with Jeffrey L. Reed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey L. Reed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2014 |
|
Last RefreshedJune 19, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationAllen County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event | COURT CERTIFICATE OF RELEASE OF MORTGAGE ISSUED TO THE ALLEN COUNTY RECORDER 2007-12809 | |
October 06, 2014 | Docket Event | ENTRY RETURNED FROM: KEITH MCBETH - 405 SOUTH DANA AVENUE - LIMA, OH 45804 REASON: ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN FILED | |
October 06, 2014 | Docket Event | ENTRY RETURNED FROM: MCBETH UNKNOWN SPOUSE IF ANY OF KEITH - 405 SOUTH DANA AVE - LIMA, OH 45804 REASON: ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN FILED | |
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | PAYMENT TO ALLEN COUNTY RECORDER Check Issued: 10/02/14 Check #95032 $32.00 Payable to: ALLEN COUNTY RECORDER. | |
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | BALANCE OF DEPOSIT TO ATTY RYAN F HEMMERLE Check Issued: 10/02/14 Check #95047 $*1152* Payable to: RYAN F HEMMERLE. | |
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event | DEPOSIT Receipt: 444720 Date: 09/30/2014 | |
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event | COST BILL FILED | |
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event | COPIES MAILED TO KEITH MCBETH MCBETH UNKNOWN SPOUSE IF ANY OF KEITH Receipt: 444801 Date: 10/01/2014 | |
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event | MAILING FEES Receipt: 444801 Date: 10/01/2014 | |
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event | PROVIDED COPIES ISSUED TO ACSO AND MAILED TO RYAN F HEMMERLE (SASE) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.