Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Johnson, Harry, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Drake, Scott N, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Judicial Assignment, Unknown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudicial Assignment, Unknown Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2006 |
CategoryDv/Ea Or Dependent Adult |
Last RefreshedMarch 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2006 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing | |
July 06, 2006 | Docket Event | Temp Restraining Order | |
July 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Filed Granted | |
June 13, 2006 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing | |
April 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing | |
March 30, 2006 | Docket Event | Temp Restraining Order | |
March 29, 2006 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.