Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rola, Audrey E, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Rola, Daniel A, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Jacobson, Jack M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJacobson, Jack M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 03, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2007 | Docket Event | Petitioner's 191 Filed | |
October 11, 2007 | Docket Event | Declaration For Default Filed | |
October 11, 2007 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
September 20, 2007 | Docket Event | Order | |
September 14, 2007 | Docket Event | Appearance Stipulation & Waiver | |
July 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
November 17, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
August 24, 2006 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
May 01, 2006 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
April 13, 2006 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.