Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Vanderwall, David G presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2006 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Imaged File | |
September 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
July 25, 2006 | Docket Event | Court's Motion to Dismiss | |
June 06, 2006 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
March 20, 2006 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference | |
January 23, 2006 | Docket Event | Petition Hearing | |
January 23, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
December 15, 2005 | Docket Event | Petition Hearing | |
November 09, 2005 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.