Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Collins, Carol Ann, filed a(n) case against Collins, Nana Opoku, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Jack M. Jacobson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2006 |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 06, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2007 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
April 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
April 17, 2007 | Docket Event | Response | |
April 17, 2007 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event | Petition | |
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons | |
February 21, 2007 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
December 15, 2006 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause: CMC | |
June 16, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
June 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.