Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Moreno, Andrea Elizabeth, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Moreno, Tommy Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Jacobson, Jack M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Review Hearing | |
December 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
November 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Filed | |
May 30, 2006 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
May 02, 2006 | Docket Event | Declaration For Default Filed | |
May 02, 2006 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
April 21, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
March 09, 2006 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
February 23, 2006 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
February 14, 2006 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.