Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
filed a(n) Restraining Order case in the jurisdiction of Stark County, ND, . Stark County, ND Superior Courts with Gion, James D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGion, James D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2023 |
CategoryRestraining Order |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationStark County, ND |
|
Case Outcome TypeSheriff'S Return Served Index # 10 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Return Served Index # 10 permanent dvpo permanent dvpo |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Disorderly Conduct Restraining Order Index # 9 (cc:SO,PD) (cc:SO,PD) |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Protection/Restraining Order Hearing (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Gion, James D) Result: Hearing Ended | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 8 DCRO DCRO |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Protection/Restraining Order Hearing (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Gion, James D) | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Return Served Index # 7 temp dcro temp dcro |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Temporary Disorderly Conduct Restraining Order Index # 6 | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 5 for hearing procedure for hearing procedure |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Petition Index # 1 for DCRO for DCRO |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 4 temporary DCRO temporary DCRO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.