Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Stark County, ND, . Stark County, ND Superior Courts with Herauf, William A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 06, 2017 |
CategoryForeclosure |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationStark County, ND |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment / Order Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 40 Certificate of Service - Notice of Entry of Order, Order Confirming Sale on Foreclosure - upon Chad M. Bangs Certificate of Service - Notice of Entry of Order, Order Confirming Sale on Foreclosure - upon Chad M. Bangs |
|
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 39 Notice of Entry of Order (Order Confirming Sale on Foreclose) Notice of Entry of Order (Order Confirming Sale on Foreclose) |
|
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 38 Confirming Sale on Foreclosure filed by Plaintiff The State of ND dba The Bank of ND Confirming Sale on Foreclosure filed by Plaintiff The State of ND dba The Bank of ND |
|
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 37 Certificate of Service - Sheriff's Return on Special Execution, proposed Order Confirming Sale on Foreclosure - upon Chad M. Bangs Certificate of Service - Sheriff's Return on Special Execution, proposed Order Confirming Sale on Foreclosure - upon Chad M. Bangs |
|
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Filing Index # 35 Sheriff's Return on Special Execution Sheriff's Return on Special Execution |
|
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 36 Proposed Order Confirming Sale on Foreclosure filed by Plaintiff The State of ND dba The Bank of ND Proposed Order Confirming Sale on Foreclosure filed by Plaintiff The State of ND dba The Bank of ND |
|
September 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Filing Index # 34 Sheriff's Return (Wholly Satisfied) and Special Execution Sheriff's Return (Wholly Satisfied) and Special Execution |
|
August 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 33 Certificate of Service - Notice of Additional Lien - upon Chad M. Bangs and Sheriff Terry Oestreich Certificate of Service - Notice of Additional Lien - upon Chad M. Bangs and Sheriff Terry Oestreich |
|
August 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 32 Notice of Additional Lien Notice of Additional Lien |
|
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 31 Affidavit of Publication (Notice of Sale) Affidavit of Publication (Notice of Sale) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.