Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, ND, . Pierce County, ND Superior Courts with Hurly, Michael P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHurly, Michael P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 22, 2018 |
CategoryQuiet Title |
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPierce County, ND |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment / Order Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 15 for Judgment for Judgment |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 16 | |
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 14 Judgment (filed by Charles Chapman) Judgment (filed by Charles Chapman) |
|
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion Index # 10 Motion for Entry of Judgment Motion for Entry of Judgment |
|
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Brief Index # 11 Brief in Support of Motion for Default Judgment Brief in Support of Motion for Default Judgment |
|
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 12 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Entry of Judgment Affidavit in Support of Motion for Entry of Judgment |
|
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 13 Order for Judgment (filed by Charles Chapman) Order for Judgment (filed by Charles Chapman) |
|
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 9 Affidavit of Service by Mail-Frank Kunnanz, Frances Kunnanz, Ralph Kunnanz, Herman Kunnanz, David Kunnanz, Emmanuel Kunnanz, Hygenus Kunnanz, Eleanor Howland, Ernest Kunnanz Affidavit of Service by Mail-Frank Kunnanz, Frances Kunnanz, Ralph Kunnanz, Herman Kunnanz, David Kunnanz, Emmanuel Kunnanz, Hygenus Kunnanz, Eleanor Howland, Ernest Kunnanz |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 8 Affidavit of Publication Affidavit of Publication |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 7 Affidavit for Service by Publication Affidavit for Service by Publication |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.