Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Desegura, Elvira Saldivar, Segura, Gerardo, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Gustafson, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Joanna Mittman presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 08, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims Appeals |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions42 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time42 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List (Court) 213820-Exhibit List Add'l Description: Re Small Claims Filed/Issued By: 923110 - Clerk EXHIBIT LIST [213820] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By CLERK [923110] |
|
July 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment 226110-Judgment Add'l Description: Re Ruling After Small Claims Trial De Novo Filed/Issued By: 924110 - Court JUDGMENT [226110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By COURT [924110] |
|
July 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Correspondence 212510-Correspondence Add'l Description: Re Exhibits Filed/Issued By: 923110 - Clerk CORRESPONDENCE [212510] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By CLERK [923110] |
|
July 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Jul 20 2007 Type: 274110 - Judgment Manner : 272210 - After Trial de Novo |
|
July 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Trial De Novo 254120-Trial DeNovo; DeSegura, E. et al. vs. Gustafson, R. ; Judge: J21930 Mittman Joanna Judge: Mittman, Joanna |
|
June 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Record on Appeal 247210-Small Claims Record on Appeal Filed/Issued By: 932210 - Attorney for Defendant SMALL CLAIMS RECORD ON APPEAL [247210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT [932210] |
|
June 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 212920-Notice of Hearing Filed/Issued By: 923110 - Clerk NOTICE OF HEARING [212920] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By CLERK [923110] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.