Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Pembina County, ND, . Pembina County, ND Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2020 |
CategoryProbate Of Will (Informal) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationPembina County, ND |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 16 Proof Of Service By Mail - Tammy Brooks, Dawn Fraser, Daniel Monette, Gary Monette Proof Of Service By Mail - Tammy Brooks, Dawn Fraser, Daniel Monette, Gary Monette |
|
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Personal Representative's Sworn Statement to Close Estate Index # 15 Co-Personal Representative's Sworn Statement To Close Estate Co-Personal Representative's Sworn Statement To Close Estate |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 14 Proof Of Service By Mail - Brooks, Fraser, D.Monette, G.Monette Proof Of Service By Mail - Brooks, Fraser, D.Monette, G.Monette |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Inventory & Appraisement Index # 12 Inventory Inventory |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 13 Notice Of Proposed Distribution Notice Of Proposed Distribution |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 10 Affidavit Of Publication Affidavit Of Publication |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 9 Notice To Creditors Notice To Creditors |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 11 Notice And Information To Heirs And Devisees Notice And Information To Heirs And Devisees |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 8 Proof Of Service By Mail - Heirs, Devisees Proof Of Service By Mail - Heirs, Devisees |
|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 7 Proof Of Service By Mail - Dept of Human Services Proof Of Service By Mail - Dept of Human Services |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.