Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Pembina County, ND, . Pembina County, ND Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2020 |
CategoryProbate Of Will (Formal) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationPembina County, ND |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 20 Affidavit Of Service By Mail - Dola A Beaty, Judy K Beaty Yeager Affidavit Of Service By Mail - Dola A Beaty, Judy K Beaty Yeager |
|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Letters Testamentary Index # 19 | |
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 18 for for Formal Probate for for Formal Probate |
|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Letters Index # 17 Letters Testamentary (Filed By Atty DuBois) Letters Testamentary (Filed By Atty DuBois) |
|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 16 Order For Formal Probate Of Will (Filed By PR Atty DuBois) Order For Formal Probate Of Will (Filed By PR Atty DuBois) |
|
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Hearing (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Fontaine, Laurie A) Parties Present Result: Hearing Ended | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Hearing (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Fontaine, Laurie A) Result: Hearing Ended | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 15 Affidavit of Publication - Order Fixing Time And Place Of Hearing Affidavit of Publication - Order Fixing Time And Place Of Hearing |
|
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 14 Affidavit Of Service By Mail - Dola A Beaty, Judy K Beaty Yeager Affidavit Of Service By Mail - Dola A Beaty, Judy K Beaty Yeager |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 13 Approving Request to Appear by Phone Approving Request to Appear by Phone |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.