Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Pembina County, ND, . Pembina County, ND Superior Courts with Whelan, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedSeptember 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPembina County, ND |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Index # 35 resent to MN address resent to MN address |
|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 34 of Dismissal of Dismissal |
|
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Other CANCELED Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Whelan, Barbara) Other |
|
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Per Judge CANCELED Court Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Whelan, Barbara) Per Judge |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request Index # 33 for Dismissal for Dismissal |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Pretrial Conference (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Whelan, Barbara) Result: Hearing Ended | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 32 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 31 to Appear and Order Removing Case from Trial Calendar to Appear and Order Removing Case from Trial Calendar |
|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 30 Certificate of Service on Dawn Charbonneau Certificate of Service on Dawn Charbonneau |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 29 Granting Withdrawal as Counsel (Pamela Coleman) Granting Withdrawal as Counsel (Pamela Coleman) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.