Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Pembina County, ND, . Pembina County, ND Superior Courts with Fontaine, Laurie A Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: SatisfiedCreditor: Bank of America, N.A.Debtor: Nicholas W Gratton (ActiveEntered: 10/29/2020Docketed: 10/29/2020, 2:59 PMDamages: $13,870.17Interest Rate: 8.00% presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 09, 2020 |
CategoryContract / Collection |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPembina County, ND |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeMoney Judgment Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 17 Satisfaction of Judgment Satisfaction of Judgment |
|
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 16 Certificate of Service by Mail of Notice of Entry of Judgment of Nicholas W Gratton Certificate of Service by Mail of Notice of Entry of Judgment of Nicholas W Gratton |
|
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 15 Notice of Entry of Judgment of Nicholas W Gratton Notice of Entry of Judgment of Nicholas W Gratton |
|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 12 of Costs and Disbursements of Costs and Disbursements |
|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 13 for Judgment for Judgment |
|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment Index # 14 Default Judgment $13,870.17 Default Judgment $13,870.17 |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 6 Affidavit Of No Answer Identification Non-Military Status And Proof Affidavit Of No Answer Identification Non-Military Status And Proof |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 7 Affidavit Of Costs And Disbursements And Amount Due Filed By Bank of America, N.A. Affidavit Of Costs And Disbursements And Amount Due Filed By Bank of America, N.A. |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 11 Notice Of Motion Notice Of Motion |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service of Motion Index # 10 Service By Mail 10/06/2020 to (Nicholas W Gratton) Service By Mail 10/06/2020 to (Nicholas W Gratton) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.