Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Pembina County, ND, . Pembina County, ND Superior Courts with Fontaine, Laurie A Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: $642.53Creditor: DCI Credit Services IncDebtor: Sara Ramos Letexier (ActiveEntered: 07/27/2020Docketed: 07/27/2020, 4:34 PMDamages: $642.53Interest Rate: 8.00% presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2020 |
CategoryContract / Collection |
Last RefreshedAugust 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPembina County, ND |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeMoney Judgment Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorneys Index # 19 Substitution of Counsel - Daniel J Nagle Substitution of Counsel - Daniel J Nagle |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 18 Notice of Entry of Judgment - Sara Ramos Letexier Notice of Entry of Judgment - Sara Ramos Letexier |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 17 Affidavit of Service by Mail - Notice of Entry of Judgment - Sara Ramos Letexier Affidavit of Service by Mail - Notice of Entry of Judgment - Sara Ramos Letexier |
|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 16 $642.53 | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 14 | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Findings Index # 15 of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order for Judgment of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order for Judgment |
|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 5 of Proof-Altru Health System 513.33 of Proof-Altru Health System 513.33 |
|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Index # 8 for Default Judgment for Default Judgment |
|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 11 Affidavit of Costs Affidavit of Costs |
|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 7 of 3.2 Motion of 3.2 Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.