Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Pembina County, ND, . Pembina County, ND Superior Courts with Fontaine, Laurie A Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: SatisfiedCreditor: Unifund CCR, LLCDebtor: Michael Denault (ActiveEntered: 02/18/2020Docketed: 02/18/2020, 1:29 PMDamages: $2,643.20Current Costs Due: 06/28/2021, Execution, $10.0007/06/2020, Execution, $10.00Interest Rate: 8.00% presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFontaine, Laurie A Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: SatisfiedCreditor: Unifund CCR, LLCDebtor: Michael Denault (ActiveEntered: 02/18/2020Docketed: 02/18/2020, 1:29 PMDamages: $2,643.20Current Costs Due: 06/28/2021, Execution, $10.0007/06/2020, Execution, $10.00Interest Rate: 8.00% Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2020 |
CategoryContract / Collection |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPembina County, ND |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeMoney Judgment Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 17 Full Satisfaction Of Judgment Full Satisfaction Of Judgment |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ Index # 16 Return Of Garnishment Execution (Satisfied In Full) Return Of Garnishment Execution (Satisfied In Full) |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Execution Index # 15 =Garnishment =Garnishment |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ Index # 14 Return of execution Return of execution |
|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Execution Index # 13 =Garnishment =Garnishment |
|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 11 Notice of Entry of Judgment Notice of Entry of Judgment |
|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 12 Certificate of Service (Michael Denault) Certificate of Service (Michael Denault) |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 9 for Judgment for Judgment |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 10 | |
February 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 8 Exhibit 1 (Account Summary) Exhibit 1 (Account Summary) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.