Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Pembina County, ND, . Pembina County, ND Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2014 |
CategoryProbate Of Will (Informal) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationPembina County, ND |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 12 Notice Of Proposed Distribution Notice Of Proposed Distribution |
|
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 13 Proof Of Service By Mail - Floyd Helgoe, Mae Ella Jackson, Larry Helgoe Proof Of Service By Mail - Floyd Helgoe, Mae Ella Jackson, Larry Helgoe |
|
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 14 Proof Of Service By Mail (Inventory) - Floyd Helgoe, Mae Ella Jackson, Larry Helgoe Proof Of Service By Mail (Inventory) - Floyd Helgoe, Mae Ella Jackson, Larry Helgoe |
|
February 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 11 Affidavit of Publication Affidavit of Publication |
|
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 10 Proof Of Service By Mail - Floyd Helgoe, Mae Ella Jackson, Larry Helgoe Proof Of Service By Mail - Floyd Helgoe, Mae Ella Jackson, Larry Helgoe |
|
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 9 Notice To Creditors Notice To Creditors |
|
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 8 Notice And Information To Heirs And Devisees Notice And Information To Heirs And Devisees |
|
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 7 Proof Of Service By Mail - Department Of Human Services Proof Of Service By Mail - Department Of Human Services |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Letters Testamentary Index # 6 | |
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Statement of Appointment of a Personal Representative Index # 5 Informal Probate of Will Informal Probate of Will |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.