Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Pembina County, ND, . Pembina County, ND Superior Courts with Fontaine, Laurie A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2014 |
CategoryContract / Collection |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPembina County, ND |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Response Index # 46 to DE's Letter to DE's Letter |
|
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 44 Notice Of Entry Of Judgment Of Dismissal Notice Of Entry Of Judgment Of Dismissal |
|
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 45 Affidavit Of Service - Roberta A. Phipps Affidavit Of Service - Roberta A. Phipps |
|
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment Index # 43 of Dismissal of Dismissal |
|
September 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Findings Index # 42 of Fact and Order for Judgment of Fact and Order for Judgment |
|
September 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Letter Index # 41 to Judge from def, dated 9/1/16 to Judge from def, dated 9/1/16 |
|
September 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 40 Affidavit Of Service - Roberta A. Phipps Affidavit Of Service - Roberta A. Phipps |
|
September 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Letter Index # 37 from Judge Fontaine to Robert Fleming from Judge Fontaine to Robert Fleming |
|
September 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 39 Judgment Judgment |
|
September 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Findings Index # 38 Findings Of Fact And Order For Judgment Findings Of Fact And Order For Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.