Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case in the jurisdiction of Pembina County, ND, . Pembina County, ND Superior Courts with Fontaine, Laurie A Converted Disposition:Party(Senum, Rick presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2006 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPembina County, ND |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment / Order Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Pursuant to Administrative Rule 19 Documents Destroyed | |
July 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 6 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT |
|
June 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Converted Event Codes Index # 4 (FREE01) SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ($415.03) WITH NOTICE OF ENTRY (FREE01) SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ($415.03) WITH NOTICE OF ENTRY |
|
June 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 5 AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING JUDGMENT AND NOTICE OF ENTRY AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING JUDGMENT AND NOTICE OF ENTRY |
|
June 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT/ORDER ENTERED Judgment JUDGMENT/ORDER ENTERED |
|
June 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 3 SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Claim Affidavit Index # 1 CLAIM AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AFFIDAVIT |
|
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 2 AFFIDAVIT OF IDENTIFICATION AFFIDAVIT OF IDENTIFICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.