Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nelson County, ND, . Nelson County, ND Superior Courts with Jensen, Jon J. Monetary Award JudgmentCreditor: Jason Lee Schuh, Creditor: Kenneth SchuhDebtor: La Verne Koenig (ActiveEntered: 12/10/2015Docketed: 12/10/2015, 9:10 AMDamages: $789.25Interest Rate: 6.50% presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 26, 2014 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedSeptember 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNelson County, ND |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeMoney Judgment Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 286 | |
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment Index # 285 Amended Amended |
|
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 284 Order for Judgment Order for Judgment |
|
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Supreme Court Judgment/Opinion Index # 282 Opinion - Affirmed Opinion - Affirmed |
|
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Supreme Court Judgment/Opinion Index # 283 Judgment Judgment |
|
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 281 Affidavit of Service on Pro-Se Plaintiff Koenig Affidavit of Service on Pro-Se Plaintiff Koenig |
|
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 280 Proposed Order for Judgment Proposed Order for Judgment |
|
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 278 Defendant's Proposed Judgment Defendant's Proposed Judgment |
|
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 279 Affidavit of Service on Laverne Koenig Affidavit of Service on Laverne Koenig |
|
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 277 Defendant's Verified Statement of Costs Defendant's Verified Statement of Costs |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.