Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Mountrail County, ND, . Mountrail County, ND Superior Courts with Hagar, Richard L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 21, 2020 |
CategoryGuardianship Of An Incapacitated Person |
Last RefreshedSeptember 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMountrail County, ND |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Outcome TypeTermination (Guardianships / Conservatorships) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 60 Confirming Termination of Guardianship and Discharging Guardian - Death of Ward (CC to Guardian via USPS 5/31/22 KJ) Confirming Termination of Guardianship and Discharging Guardian - Death of Ward (CC to Guardian via USPS 5/31/22 KJ) |
|
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 59 Confirming Termination of Guardianship and Discharging Guardian - Death of Ward Confirming Termination of Guardianship and Discharging Guardian - Death of Ward |
|
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition Index # 58 for Termination of Guardianship and Discharge of Guardian - Death of Ward for Termination of Guardianship and Discharge of Guardian - Death of Ward |
|
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 57 of Petition to Terminate Guardianship and Discharge Guardian - Death of Ward of Petition to Terminate Guardianship and Discharge Guardian - Death of Ward |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 56 of Review of Guardian's Annual Reports (CC to Guardian via USPS 3/21/22 KJ) of Review of Guardian's Annual Reports (CC to Guardian via USPS 3/21/22 KJ) |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Guardian and/or Conservatorship Annual Report Index # 54 Annual Financial Accounting - 01/01/2021 - 12/18/2021 Annual Financial Accounting - 01/01/2021 - 12/18/2021 |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Guardian and/or Conservatorship Annual Report Index # 55 Annual Wellbeing Report - 01/01/2021 - 12/18/2021 Annual Wellbeing Report - 01/01/2021 - 12/18/2021 |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Annual Report Mailed Index # 53 | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 52 of Review of Anuual Reports of Review of Anuual Reports |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential Information Form Index # 51 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.