Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Mountrail County, ND, . Mountrail County, ND Superior Courts with Louser, Stacy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMountrail County, ND |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment / Order Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 11 | |
October 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 12 on Carly Lumly on Carly Lumly |
|
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Findings Index # 9 of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order for Judgment (CC: Parties via USPS by th on 9/13/2017) (CC: SDU via email MC 09/14/2017) of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order for Judgment (CC: Parties via USPS by th on 9/13/2017) (CC: SDU via email MC 09/14/2017) |
|
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment Index # 10 (CC: Parties via USPS by th on 9/13/2017) (CC: SDU via email MC 09/14/2017) (CC: Parties via USPS by th on 9/13/2017) (CC: SDU via email MC 09/14/2017) |
|
September 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation / Agreement Index # 5 Marital Termination Agreement Marital Termination Agreement |
|
September 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment and Case Number Index # 8 | |
September 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Findings Index # 6 Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order for Judgment Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order for Judgment |
|
September 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Complaint Index # 2 Complaint Complaint |
|
September 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 4 Admission of Service (serving C Lumley) Admission of Service (serving C Lumley) |
|
September 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Confidential Information Form Index # 3 Confidential Information form Confidential Information form |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.